skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 11:57:10 PM

Williams, Robert Scott

CPSO#: 27292

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert Scott Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Williams ( CPSO# 27292 )

Business Address:
238 Grand River Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2N7
Phone Number: (519) 755-8587

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. M. Rasa 65 Dundas St E Paris ON N3L 3H1
Date Received: 23 May 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019