skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 9:36:06 AM

Karas, Yair

CPSO#: 27261

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Hebrew University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Eye Associates Of Don Mills 201 - 6 Maginn Mews North York, ON M3C 0G9 Phone: (416) 447-4611
Date Received: 22 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018