skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 4:24:25 PM

Henderson, Robert Wayne

CPSO#: 27241

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Apr 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trent Hills Family Health Team
119 Isabella Street
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone: (705) 653-1801
Fax: (705) 653-5483 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R.W. Henderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Henderson ( CPSO# 27241 )

Business Address:
Hillside Family Medicine
119 Isabella Street
2nd Floor
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1801

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT WAYNE HENDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDERSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1975