skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 9:56:11 AM

Roy, Robert John

CPSO#: 27203

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R.J. Roy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2014