skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/2019 2:31:57 PM

Bayang, Gregorio T.

CPSO#: 27163

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 18 Sep 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Manila Central University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1974
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 18 Sep 1990

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Sep 1990
Summary:

 In September 1990, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bayang guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an 
 act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Committee 
 also found Dr. Bayang to be incompetent, as defined in s. 60(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 
 1980, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, 
 skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that 
 demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. 
 Bayang(s licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 30 Apr 1993
Hearing Date(s): Aug 28, 1990

Application for Reinstatement   Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
Decision Date: 15 Sep 1995
Decision: Application Denied