skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:07:31 AM

Castiglione, John Salvatore

CPSO#: 27143

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Dec 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 1974
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
1670 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3M2
Phone: (416) 656-0080
Fax: (416) 656-2010 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Castiglione Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Castiglione ( CPSO# 27143 )

Business Address:
206 - 1670 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3M2
Phone Number: (416) 656-0080

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN SALVATORE CASTIGLIONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTIGLIONE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1974

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 11, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)