skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 4:11:23 PM

Gordon, Michael

CPSO#: 27132

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Nov 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of St. Andrews, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst Street
North York ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2613
Fax: (416) 785-2863 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL GORDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORDON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1974