skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/08/2019 12:39:10 PM

Barreca, Peter Anthony

CPSO#: 27070

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Oct 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Family Practice
61 Queen Street, East
3rd floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7428
Fax: (416) 867-7498 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Peter Barreca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Barreca ( CPSO# 27070 )

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
Family Practice
3rd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7428

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER ANTHONY BARRECA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRECA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1974