skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 5:25:14 PM

Lal, Rekha Basant

CPSO#: 27037

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Delhi, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Parvesh Anand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2017
Corporation Name: Dr. Rekha Lal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Physician Relations Health Information Services 13 - 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 11 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018