skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/2019 2:31:18 PM

Hayes, William Alphonsus

CPSO#: 26992

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: W. A. Hayes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 12 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Record storage and retrival services inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S North York ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 28 May 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019