skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/2019 7:00:20 PM

Powles, Alexander Charles Peter

CPSO#: 26939

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Aug 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Room T2137
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34299
Fax: (905) 540-6594 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Powles Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Powles ( CPSO# 26939 )
Dr. T. Kaigas ( CPSO# 29385 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Room T2137
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER CHARLES PETER POWLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWLES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1976