skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 4:36:10 AM

Ylanko, Veli Juhani

CPSO#: 26795

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Jul 2011

Summary

Date of Death: 16-Jul-2013

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Finnish

Education:University of Turku, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2011