skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 9:26:06 AM

Abbas, Dennis Rahim

CPSO#: 26708

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jun 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Texas

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Dec 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: December 28, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dennis Rahim Abbas to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 28, 2017:

Dr. Abbas has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.