skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 11:48:47 AM

Casper, Robert Fredric Joseph

CPSO#: 26688

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jan 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1101
655 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4
Phone: (416) 506-0804 Ext. 3232
Fax: (416) 972-0036 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert Casper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Casper ( CPSO# 26688 )

Business Address:
1101 - 655 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4
Phone Number: (416) 506-0804

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT FREDRIC JOSEPH CASPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASPER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Aug 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1984