skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 6:30:45 PM

Herzig, Sheldon

CPSO#: 26662

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Herzig Eye Institute
150 Bloor Street West
Suite 210
Toronto ON  M5S 2X9
Phone: (416) 929-2020
Fax: (416) 929-0232 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sheldon Herzig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Herzig ( CPSO# 26662 )

Business Address:
The Herzig Eye Institute
The Colonade
210-150 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 2X9
Phone Number: (416) 929-2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHELDON HERZIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERZIG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1974