skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 4:35:34 AM

Goresky, Gerald Victor

CPSO#: 26635

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Sep 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jan 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 1983