skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:24:08 AM

Wilson, George Andrew Charles

CPSO#: 26621

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. G. A. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 24 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: HandstheFamilyHelp Network 26 Bill's Drive Bracebridge, ON P1L 1T1 Telephone: 705-645-3155 or 1-800-668-8555 Website: www.HandstheFamilyHelpnetwork.ca
Date Received: 30 Sep 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2015