skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 9:26:29 AM

Marchuk, Elizabeth Kathleen

CPSO#: 26613

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jul 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 2000