skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 9:33:24 AM

Saksun, Jana Maria

CPSO#: 26602

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jun 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Saksun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 10 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to the following address: Suite 1208 250 The East Mall Toronto, ON M9B 6L3
Date Received: 10 Nov 2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JANA MARIA SAKSUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAKSUN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1974