skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 6:45:02 AM

Young, Vincent Peter John

CPSO#: 26548

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: V.P.J. Young Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital Regional Cancer Centre 501 Smyth Road Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 02 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017