skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:11:18 AM

Fiala, Marta Ann

CPSO#: 26483

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Charles Univ Prague Faculty Paediatrics, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2012