skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 9:27:56 PM

Hanna, Nasr Nagi

CPSO#: 26403

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nasr Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 20 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2013