skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 9:23:32 AM

Jamieson, Christopher George

CPSO#: 26394

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999