skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/09/2019 10:36:21 PM

Forson, Agatha

CPSO#: 26372

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 12 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ghana

Education:National University of Ireland, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Agatha Forson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2018