skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 11:11:00 PM

Bhargava, Someshwar

CPSO#: 26367

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Rajasthan University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 11 Burrows Road Ottawa, ON K1J 6E6
Date Received: 25 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015