skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/06/2019 12:50:06 PM

Butchey, Joseph Ramsay Krishnamurti

CPSO#: 26365

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Butchey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. 1 High Meadow Pl, North York, ON M9L 0A3 Phone: 1 800-775-0093 www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 15 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019