skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 6:07:37 PM

Peters, Walter Joseph

CPSO#: 26346

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Medical Records Storage 111 St Regis Crescent S North York, ON M3J 1Y6 or infor@rsrs.com or 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 24 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 15 Apr 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2019