skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 11:10:20 PM

Chang, Peter Pai-Tak

CPSO#: 26320

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 607 220 Duncan Mill Road Toronto, ON M3B 3J5
Date Received: 26 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014