skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 6:51:07 AM

Zanbilowicz, Jose

CPSO#: 26234

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Mar 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2002