skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 7:46:05 PM

Desroches, Gilles

CPSO#: 26202

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gilles Desroches Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Desroches ( CPSO# 26202 )

Business Address:
Suite 950
220 Laurier Avenue West
Ottawa ON  K1P 5Z9
Phone Number: (613) 236-1907

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical records storage facility: Records management Ltd. Paitents looking to obtain copies of their medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093 www.recordsregistry.ca or 13 - 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 04 Jul 2019


Address: Records Management Ltd I High Meadow Place North York, ON M9L 0A3 Phone: 1-800-775-0093 www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 28 May 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2019