skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 3:34:22 PM

Morales, Alvaro

CPSO#: 26175

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 May 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Xavier Pontifical University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alvaro Morales Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 12 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Kingston General Hospital 76 Stuart St Kingston, ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 17 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 31 Oct 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2019