skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 6:43:20 AM

Kamitakahara, Ernest George

CPSO#: 26164

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Sep 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Coober Pedy Community Health Centre
89 McDougall Street
Coober Pedy 5723
Australia
Phone: +61-8-86725102
Fax: +61-8-86725819

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERNEST GEORGE KAMITAKAHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMITAKAHARA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Mar 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1990