skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 11:44:12 PM

Cunnington, John Paul William

CPSO#: 26100

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hamilton Health Sciences 1200 Main St W Hamilton, ON L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 01 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018