skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 6:14:17 PM

Weiss, Margaretta Junasa

CPSO#: 26059

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 1995
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the Philippines, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 14 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 31 May 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 1995