skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 3:55:51 PM

Turner, Robert Douglas

CPSO#: 26027

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Aug 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
380 Burnham Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 1T6
Phone: (705) 748-4041
Fax: (705) 748-3907 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert D. Turner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Turner ( CPSO# 26027 )

Business Address:
103 - 380 Burnham Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 1T6
Phone Number: (705) 748-4041

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT DOUGLAS TURNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2005