skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:33:28 PM

Gutelius, John Robert

CPSO#: 26002

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1962 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2000