skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 4:15:24 PM

Adam, Paul

CPSO#: 25986

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 Sherbourne Street
Suite 411
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: (416) 922-3417
Fax: (416) 961-0383 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1371 Neilson Road
Suite 310
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-1413
Fax: (416) 281-6242
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 28 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL ADAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1973