skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:56:09 AM

Chong, Dennis Kenneth

CPSO#: 25978

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Dec 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 345 Lakeshore Road East Oakville, ON L6J 1J5
Date Received: 02 Nov 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Dec 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: December 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dennis Kenneth Chong to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 15, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Chong failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Chong resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)