skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 12:26:09 PM

Bell, James Michael

CPSO#: 25956

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jun 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 1997