skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 12:11:02 AM

Gordon, John Albert

CPSO#: 25862

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John A. Gordon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 28 2016

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Dyncare Ottawa: 1-800-668-2714
Date Received: 07 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019