skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 6:55:10 PM

Gray, Robin Ritchie

CPSO#: 25843

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2007