skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 4:13:59 PM

Rock, Gail Ann

CPSO#: 25822

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jul 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
270 Sandridge Road
Ottawa ON  K1L 5A2
Phone: (613) 741-0174
Fax: 613 749-6131 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GAIL ANN ROCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1973