skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 4:12:11 PM

Silverberg, Jay David Howard

CPSO#: 25747

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite H 149
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4761
Fax: (416) 480-5258 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jay Silverberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Silverberg ( CPSO# 25747 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite H 149
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4761

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAY DAVID HOWARD SILVERBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1973