skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:38:52 PM

Ho, Michael Man Kai

CPSO#: 25714

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010