skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 12:16:46 AM

Andrew, Philip John

CPSO#: 25700

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: Millman, Philip John (used until: 08 Mar 1994 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
221B Mitton Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 6H5
Phone: (519) 339-1031
Fax: (519) 339-7591 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Philip Andrew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Andrew ( CPSO# 25700 )

Business Address:
Unit B
221 Mitton Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 6H5
Phone Number: (519) 339-1031


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PHILIP JOHN ANDREW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDREW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Sep 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 May 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2011