skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 4:36:09 PM

Shamess, Charles Joseph

CPSO#: 25668

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jun 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5th Floor, Holland Cross Tower B
1600 Scott St.
Ottawa, ON K1A 0K9
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: 613-948-7995 Electoral District: 07

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact Dynacare at: 613-738-1242.
Date Received: 16 Sep 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 28 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHARLES JOSEPH SHAMESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMESS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1973