skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/09/2019 9:27:14 PM

Liem, Sek Kong

CPSO#: 25555

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jun 2002

Summary

Date of Death: 21-Jan-2014

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Hasanuddin, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2002