skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/06/2019 1:15:11 PM

Evans, William Kenneth

CPSO#: 25507

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Mar 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLIAM KENNETH EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1973