skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 4:10:10 PM

Belovic, Branislav

CPSO#: 25480

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Mar 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:University of Comenius, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MCI The Doctors Office
Unit 15
2575 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5K 2M6
Phone: (905)820-3310
Fax: (905)820-3312 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. B. Belovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Belovic ( CPSO# 25480 )

Business Address:
MCI The Doctors Office
15-2575 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5K 2M6
Phone Number: (905) 850-3310

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 26 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRANISLAV BELOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELOVIC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1973