skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 4:14:28 PM

Fieldstone, Paul Raymond

CPSO#: 25456

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 21 Oct 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 21 Oct 1992